skip to content

Clinton, Theresa Frances

CPSO#: 29719

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Nov 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Robinson, Theresa Frances (used until: 02 Aug 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. Clinton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 3011 Nelson Crescent Denman Island BC V0R1T0
Date Received: 21 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019