Cliche-Fontaine, Marie-Michele (CPSO#: 99359)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 2014