skip to content

Clerk, Shirish Vaikunthlal

CPSO#: 27072

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Bombay, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.