skip to content

Cleiman, Paula Feigenbaum

CPSO#: 88902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
UHN Division of Emergency
Room G S 480 R F E
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paula F. Cleiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cleiman ( CPSO# 88902 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
UHN Division of Emergency
200 Elizabeth Street
RFE-GS-480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:27 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAULA FEIGENBAUM CLEIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011