skip to content

Clay, Wendy Arlene

CPSO#: 21382

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective:06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000