skip to content

Clarke, Margaret Elizabeth

CPSO#: 24835

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 2002

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Jul-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 22 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2002