skip to content

Clarke, Leigh Langstroth

CPSO#: 24221

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Sep 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 27, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:

On June 30, 2009, Centre de sante communautaire du Temiskaming notified the College that Dr. Leigh Langstroth Clarke's privileges were suspended, effective May 27, 2009.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2011

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 19, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Clarke was subject to an investigation by the College on allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Clarke resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 1, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 1, 2011, Dr. Leigh Langstroth Clarke has resigned from the College.