skip to content

Clarke, Blaise Alexander

CPSO#: 85366

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3396
Fax: (416) 340-5517 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke and Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Sep 2006
PEAP - CF - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active
             Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke may practise medicine independently in anatomic
            pathology, only.