skip to content

Clark, William Foster

CPSO#: 28129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Apr 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
251 B Sydenham St
London Ontario
N6A 1W4
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 878 8507
Fax: (519) 685-8047 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

251 B Sydenham St
London ON  N6A 1W4
Canada
Phone: 519 878 8507
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

251 B Sydenham St
London ON  N6A 1W4
Canada
Phone: 519 878 8507
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.F. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Clark ( CPSO# 28129 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FOSTER CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1976