skip to content

Clark, Edward George

CPSO#: 87888

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 prom. Riverside drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82569
Fax: (613) 738-8337 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Dialysis Clinic
691 Brookdale Ave
Cornwall ON  K6J 5C6
Canada
Phone: 613-937-4555
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E. G. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Clark ( CPSO# 87888 )
Dr. A. Baines ( CPSO# 96939 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Prom. Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 789-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2007