skip to content

Clark, Donald Leslie

CPSO#: 29016

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994