skip to content

Clark, David Alexander

CPSO#: 21797

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Feb 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Cancer Centre 699 Concession St Hamilton ON L8V 5C2 and Hamilton Sciences Centre McMaster University Medical Records Rm 1D14 or Dpt of Medicine Rm 3H1E 1280 Main St W Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017