skip to content

Clark, Beverley Alfretta

CPSO#: 15076

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Burgess, Beverley Alfretta Clark (used until: 18 Oct 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006