skip to content

Clare, Sanford Thomas

CPSO#: 21049

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011