skip to content

Citren, Robert Michael

CPSO#: 26447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 May 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Kestell Blvd.
Oakville ON  L6H 7M5
Phone: (905) 339-6771 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007
Corporation Name: Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Citren ( CPSO# 26447 )

Business Address:
Burlington Professional Centre
STL Diagnostic Imaging
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 637-6608

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL CITREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CITREN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1974