skip to content

Cieslak, Martin

CPSO#: 93789

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University College, Cork, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: 519-631-2020 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cieslak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cieslak ( CPSO# 93789 )

Business Address:
St.Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARTIN CIESLAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIESLAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014