skip to content

Cicero, Mark

CPSO#: 97543

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
751 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-742-2636 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cicero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cicero ( CPSO# 97543 )
Dr. C. Martorelli ( CPSO# 97583 )

Business Address:
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 742-2636

Business Address:
McMaster University
Student Wellness Centre
MUSC B101
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK CICERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017