Ciccolini, Amanda Christina (CPSO#: 100180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
5283 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan ON  L4H 2T2
Phone: 905-264-8311
Fax: 905-264-0801
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Canada
Phone: 416-494-7396
Fax: 416-494-0129
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 13 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA CHRISTINA CICCOLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CICCOLINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2018