skip to content

Church, Alanna Joyce

CPSO#: 84861

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Pathology, Boston Children's Hospital, 300 Longwood Avenue, Boston, MA, USA, 02115
Date Received: 19 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 24 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015