Chung, Win Yan (CPSO#: 99567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 7057591234
Fax: 7052538759
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

733 Third Line East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 7C1
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Win Yan Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )

Business Address:
733 Third Line East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 7C1

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 6J8
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WIN YAN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014