skip to content

Chung, Wilfred Wing Fan

CPSO#: 31716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-6133 Ext. 774
Fax: (613) 258-1225 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 5, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 5, 2021, Kemptville District Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Wilfred Wing Fan Chung has voluntarily ceased to practise at Kemptville District Hospital. His privileges will expire by September 20, 2021.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILFRED WING FAN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980