skip to content

Chung, Shari Ashika

CPSO#: 84616

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Midtown Medical
565 College Street, Suite 203
Toronto ON  M6G 1B2
Phone: (416) 538-6653
Fax: (416) 538-9766 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4th Floor
60 Murray Street
PO Box 25
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 3190
Fax: 416-586-3175
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shari Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chung ( CPSO# 84616 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
203 - 565 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 538-6653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARI ASHIKA CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.