skip to content

Chung, Caroline

CPSO#: 87926

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Caroline Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Jan 2008
EL - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017