skip to content

Chung, Bryan Tak-Chee

CPSO#: 90297

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bryan Tak-Chee Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chung ( CPSO# 90297 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:15 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRYAN TAK-CHEE CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 16 Mar 2009 to 27 Mar 2009
EL - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013