skip to content

Chung, Bruce Tang Wing

CPSO#: 29696

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Durham Medical Clinic c/o Dr. Sarita Singh 368 College Street North Durham ON N0G 1R0 Tel: 519-369-2510 Fax: 519-369-3831
Date Received: 12 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015