skip to content

Chui, Sze Wing

CPSO#: 94747

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 34435 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chui ( CPSO# 94747 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
Room C3 - 106
London ON  N6G 0M2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:21 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2021 Active
 Dr. SZE WING CHUI may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.