Chubbs, Christopher Scott (CPSO#: 97134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2014

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
Trainig Centre
30 Ortona Road
PO Box 1000 STN MAIN
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424 1200 Ext. 7804
Fax: (705) 423 2613
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435 6281
Fax: (705) 434 5142
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

31 Canadian Forces Health Services
641 Cambrai Road
PO Box 1000, Station Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Canada
Phone: 705 424 1200 Ext. 3647
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. S. Chubbs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chubbs ( CPSO# 97134 )

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
30 Dunham Drive
Tecumseh ON  L9R 0G1
Phone Number: (705) 434-2141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SCOTT CHUBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUBBS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: December 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On December 13, 2018, Christopher Chubbs was found guilty of operating a motor vehicle while impaired by alcohol contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. Dr. Chubbs is prohibited from driving for a period of 12 months and was ordered to pay a fine of $1800 plus a victim surcharge of $540.