skip to content

Chuback, Jennifer Elizabeth

CPSO#: 89087

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. E.
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer Chuback Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chuback ( CPSO# 89087 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH CHUBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUBACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2015