skip to content

Chuang, Rita Jo-Yun

CPSO#: 95273

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-978-6976
Fax: 416-978-7144 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Champagne And Dr. Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Champagne ( CPSO# 95271 )
Dr. R. Chuang ( CPSO# 95273 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology, 5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Hospital
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RITA JO-YUN CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 09 Feb 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013