skip to content

Chuang, Monica Meng-Ru

CPSO#: 84738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Monica Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chuang ( CPSO# 84738 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA MENG-RU CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011