skip to content

Chu, Jennifer Lee-Ann

CPSO#: 86175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Names: Chu DiBernardo, Jennifer Lee-Ann (used until: 19 Mar 2014 )     Chu, Jennifer Lee-Ann (used until: 11 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1438B Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4T 1Y5
Canada
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 49589
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chu ( CPSO# 86175 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: 416-864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEE-ANN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012