skip to content

Chrom, Vivian Hananiah

CPSO#: 17213

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1958
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003