skip to content

Christou, Marie Grace

CPSO#: 93205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Blood Disease Centre
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marie Grace Christou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christou ( CPSO# 93205 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Blood Disease Centre
The Ottawa Hospital
Box 704
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE GRACE CHRISTOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018