Brown, Christopher Waclaw (CPSO#: 77632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Queensway Carleton Hospital
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 408
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 225-1188
Fax: (613) 225-7770
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Arnprior District Memorial Hospital
350 John N
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd.
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher W. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 77632 )

Business Address:
The Queensway Carlton Hospital
Suite 408
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 225-1188

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WACLAW BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010