skip to content

Hassell, Christopher Hilton

CPSO#: 30937

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Nov 2022
EXPIRY DATE
09 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Nov 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Nov 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2022
Summary:

On November 15, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Hassell failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College, in relation to his:
  • provision of COVID-19 vaccine exemptions;
  • management of patients in relation to COVID-19 treatment and prevention, including inappropriate prescribing;
  • communication of inaccurate and/or misleading information in relation to COVID-19;
  • failure to comply with an Interim Order;
  • failure to cooperate with the College’s investigation; and
  • offering of services outside of Ontario without registration.
The Tribunal also found that Dr. Hassell is incompetent.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Hassell attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. Dr. Hassell pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by December 15, 2022.

Dr. Hassell also entered into an undertaking in which he agreed to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, effective immediately.
 
The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-11-15

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 15, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 2, 2022, Dr. Hassell was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.
In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hassell resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.  Once these allegations have been determined by the Discipline Committee, the decision will be available to the public on the Public Register.
Dr. Hassell was also the subject of an open investigation regarding his standard of practice and conduct. In exchange for this undertaking, the College is taking no further action on the investigation.