Christopher, Dawn Stephanie (CPSO#: 96928)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Howard University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 11 Feb 2013 to 10 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013