skip to content

Anjema, Christopher Michael

CPSO#: 73372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
735 St Clair Street
Anjema Eye Institute
Chatham ON  N7L 0E9
Phone: 519 380 0008 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 6 - 2 Main Street S
Anjema Eye Institute
Bayfield ON  N0M 1G0
Canada
Phone: 226 408 8578
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Lasik MD Mississauga
5025 Orbitor Dr
Bldg 2 - 3rd Floor
Mississauga ON  L4W 4Y5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

276 Mud St W
Lasik MD Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8J 3Z6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

200 Columbia St
TLC Laser Eye Centre Waterloo
University of Waterloo, School of O
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

10-407 Laurier Ave W
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: 613 232 2444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

R40-142 Fullarton St
London ON  N6A 0A4
Canada
Phone: +1 855-756-202
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

120-2235 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON  M2J 5B5
Canada
Phone: 5198093097
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher M. Anjema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anjema ( CPSO# 73372 )

Business Address:
2 Main Street South
Unit #6
Bayfield ON  N0M 1G0
Phone Number: 548-248-5766

Business Address:
735 St Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7M 5J7
Phone Number: (519) 380-0008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 28, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 28, 2021, Chatham-Kent Health Alliance (the “Hospital”) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Anjema was reappointed to the Hospital’s Professional Staff for the 2021/2022 credentialing year, subject to conditions, including with respect to reporting to the Hospital.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jan 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 26 Jan 2023 Active
 As from January 26, 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christopher Michael Anjema in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Anjema to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL ANJEMA
("Dr. Anjema")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Anjema, certificate of registration number 73372, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that following a finding of professional misconduct by the Discipline Tribunal being made against me, I submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice in Ophthalmology. 

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review and reflection of the following policies:            

1.	Medical Records Documentation, College Policy;

2.	Managing Tests, College Policy.

(b)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(6)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Anjema, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after entering into this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(7)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Anjema, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(10)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(13)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a finding of professional misconduct, Dr. Anjema submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment raised concerns about his standard of practice in Ophthalmology. As a result: 

Dr. Anjema will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and test management.

Dr. Anjema's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College in approximately six months.

(c)	I, Dr. Anjema, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Anjema, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the Reassessment; and

(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.  


Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 2021
Summary:

On March 22, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, allegations of Dr. Anjema’s professional misconduct related to his ophthalmology practice, including concerns about aspects of his clinical care, patient communication, clinical documentation and billing practices. Dr. Anjema admitted certain facts and pleaded no contest to others.
 
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Anjema, counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Anjema. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea, the Committee found that Dr. Anjema committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
Disposition
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts Regarding Penalty, and a joint submission from the parties as to an appropriate penalty in this case, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
 
• Dr. Anjema attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Anjema’s certificate of registration for four months commencing July 1, 2021
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Anjema’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order
• Dr. Anjema pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,370.
 
The Committee’s full reasons for decision were released in May 2021 and are available for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 22, 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 26, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Michael Anjema to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 26, 2023:
 
Following a finding of professional misconduct, Dr. Anjema submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment raised concerns about his standard of practice in Ophthalmology. As a result:

Dr. Anjema will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and test management.

Dr. Anjema’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College in approximately six months.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective August 20, 2019, Dr. Anjema has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: