skip to content

Christie, Tyler Scott

CPSO#: 88916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tyler S. Christie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Christie ( CPSO# 88916 )

Business Address:
1122 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 3J6
Phone Number: (705) 566-7100

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Drs. Caruso, Christie and Bourdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TYLER SCOTT CHRISTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010