Farah, Christian (CPSO#: 80228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420 Ext. 6580
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian Farah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Farah ( CPSO# 80228 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
102 - 1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 739-7753

Business Address:
308 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 521-3223

Business Address:
802 - 1280 Old Innes
Ottawa ON  K1B 5M7

Business Address:
100 - 2 Gurdwara Road
Nepean ON  K2E 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 216-1823

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K2H 2H1

Business Address:
Winchester Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN FARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2006