skip to content

Christakis, Panos George

CPSO#: 98220

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yale University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street, Suite 501
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-1335
Fax: (416) 928-5075 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

200-245 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4K1N2
Canada
Phone: 416-462-0393
Fax: 416-462-3612
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Panos G. Christakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 97690 )
Dr. P. Christakis ( CPSO# 98220 )

Business Address:
Floor 2
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7480

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Business Address:
Suite 200
245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 462-0393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PANOS GEORGE CHRISTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2018