skip to content

Choy, Stephen Che Kit

CPSO#: 100033

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Choy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choy ( CPSO# 100033)

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Business Address:
202-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 471-6996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHE KIT CHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017