skip to content

Chowdhry, Atif Ahmed

CPSO#: 92219

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington and Area FHT
59 Main Street East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A7
Phone: (519) 322-1100 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Mem Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Chowdhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chowdhry ( CPSO# 92219 )

Business Address:
59 Main Street East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 322-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ATIF AHMED CHOWDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOWDHRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2013