skip to content

Chow, Winsion

CPSO#: 95272

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
111 Sherwood Dr
Unit B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3V1
Phone: 613-798-1010
Fax: 613-216-8988 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Winsion Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chow ( CPSO# 95272 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 798-1010

Business Address:
111 Sherwood Dr
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3V1

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WINSION CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016