skip to content

Chow, Stephen Shu-Sum

CPSO#: 31145

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 461-0939
Fax: (416) 461-4717 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ste 201
607 Gerrard Street
Toronto ON  M4M 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-0939
Fax: (416) 461-4717
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen S. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chow ( CPSO# 31145 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 461-0939

Business Address:
Suite 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:07 Sep 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN SHU-SUM CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1982