skip to content

Chow, Peter Hong

CPSO#: 25453

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter H. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Hong Chow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 4, 2017:

As of July 31, 2017, Dr. Chow has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.