skip to content

Chow, King Yin

CPSO#: 88447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2855 Markham Rd
Clarity Eye
Scarborough ON  M1X 0C3
Phone: 4166633937
Fax: 4166633731 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
Room L1 - 040
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

145 Kingston Road East Unit 3
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4
Canada
Phone: 416 663 3937
Fax: 416 663 3731
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: King Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chow ( CPSO# 88447 )

Business Address:
Clarity Eye Institute
300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:20 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KING YIN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014