skip to content

Chow, Kan-Yan

CPSO#: 24402

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Health Information Services and Document Storage Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Jun 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017