skip to content

Chow, Jane

CPSO#: 88492

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Chow, Jane Dicko (used until: 04 Nov 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (416) 482-8880
Fax: (416) 482-8881 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4261 Highway 7
Markham ON
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 940-1787 Ext. 4211
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

205 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke, ON
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5L7
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-6622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jane Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chow ( CPSO# 88492 )

Business Address:
202 - 2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 482-8880

Business Address:
4261 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Phone Number: (905) 940-1781

Business Address:
205 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5L7
Phone Number: (416) 675-6622

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANE CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010