skip to content

Chow, Jacqueline Wing-Mun

CPSO#: 95092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
White's Medical Clinic
727 Jane St.
York ON  M6N 4B3
Phone: (416) 763-8880 Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: White's Medical Clinic 727 Jane Street York ON M6N 4B3 Canada
Date Received: 28 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Jacqueline Wing-Mun Chow may practise family medicine at:

                  (i)   White's  Medical  Clinic  in York, Ontario, while under supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (ii)  only in accordance with the  Retraining  Program  approved  by  the
                        College.                                                     
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Chow's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Chow's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Chow is no longer enrolled in the Retraining Program, or
                  
                  (iv)  the College finds  the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Chow's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  May 1, 2020, and will expire on or before
                  October 31, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.