skip to content

Chow, Clara Kayei

CPSO#: 86360

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 Jun 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009